THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:35:08 AM
Asim, Muhammad
CPSO#:
90157
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Department of Pediatrics
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 4108
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 06 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2017 |