THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:14:53 AM
Mete, Ozgur
CPSO#:
90155
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Turkish
Education: Istanbul University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine and
Pathobiology 11th Fl Eaton Wing
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3004
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Laboratory Medicine |
Effective:11 Jan 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 09 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |