THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:05:38 PM
Gdalevitch, Perry
CPSO#:
90132
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2011 |