THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:31:23 AM
Adabachi, Nathalie Marie
CPSO#:
90118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Feb 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Jan 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MARIE ADABACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADABACHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2016 |