THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:24:08 PM
Ahmed Abdalla, Elnazeer Osman
CPSO#:
90059
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Islamia University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Dec 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Dec 2010
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Western University, 01 Mar 2023 to 24 May 2023
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
Western University, 25 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Western University, 01 Jul 2023 to 29 Feb 2024
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Dec 2010 |