THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:21:39 AM
Martinez Cajas, Jorge Luis
CPSO#:
90049
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queens University
Room 3010 Etherington Hall
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-6000 Ext. 75471
Fax: (613) 533-6863
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Colombia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORGE LUIS MARTINEZ CAJAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINEZ CAJAS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2013 |