THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:33:00 PM
Ahmed, Muhammad Ejaz
CPSO#:
89990
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of the Punjab, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2008 to 23 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 24 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Ottawa, 01 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |