THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:54:19 AM
Bergman, Jacobus Johannes Gerardus Hendrikus Maria
CPSO#:
89970
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
05 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: State University of Utrecht, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Oct 2018 |