THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 14:08:02 PM
Khan, Saima Waheed
CPSO#:
89963
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Ziauddin Medical University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MAVIS MEDIX
780 Burnhamthorpe Road West, Unit 4
Mississauga ON L5C 3X3
Phone: (905) 277 5454
Fax: (905) 277-1818
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAIMA WAHEED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jan 2009 to 27 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Nov 2009 to 28 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2010 |