THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:22:05 AM
Tai, Christine Joan Yee-Jen
CPSO#:
89932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Phone: 613-599-3321
Fax: 613-599-3366
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JOAN YEE-JEN TAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2012 |