THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:15:41 AM
Eiriksson, Lua Ruhiyyih
CPSO#:
89877
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6343
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Oncology |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUA RUHIYYIH EIRIKSSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EIRIKSSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2009 to 08 Feb 2009
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2008 |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2010 |