THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:59:06 PM
Dembo, Justine Sarah
CPSO#:
89824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry K3W-44
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 6736
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUSTINE SARAH DEMBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEMBO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2017 |