THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:17:32 AM
Wasil, Bushra Iram
CPSO#:
89734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
250 Erie St S
Leamington ON N8H 3C2
Phone: 519-398 -9395
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jul 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BUSHRA IRAM WASIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASIL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 10 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2019 |