THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:15:46 PM
Mazhar, Danish
CPSO#:
89726
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Amherstburg Family Health Team
Unit 101
721 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON N9V 2M4
Phone: (519) 736-7770
Fax: (519) 736-7702
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANISH MAZHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZHAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Aug 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2012 |