THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:12:55 AM
Radovanovic, Ivan
CPSO#:
89712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Serbian
Education: University of Geneva, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
University of Toronto
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6207
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:23 Jan 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
|
Active |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On February 16th, 2023, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Ivan Radovanovic in respect of an incidents that took place in 2014 and 2015.