THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:47:57 AM
Alqurashi, Waleed
CPSO#:
89672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paed Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: (613) 738-4885
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: AlQurashi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 10 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALEED ALQURASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQURASHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2013 |