THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:20:28 PM
Al-Rawi, Firas Adil Tawfiq
CPSO#:
89632
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tawfiq, Firas Adil (used until: 08 Jul 2009 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rfe Gs 480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: (416) 340-4300
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:15 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FIRAS ADIL TAWFIQ AL-RAWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-RAWI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2008 to 07 Oct 2008
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2008 to 15 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2009 to 15 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2010 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2013 |