THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 7:47:49 AM
Sadera, Neena Jyoti Ruby
CPSO#:
89464
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1182 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON L7S 1C5
Phone: (905) 631-1939
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEENA JYOTI RUBY SADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SADERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2014 |