THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:02:22 PM
Iftene, Felicia
CPSO#:
89167
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
20 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Vartic-Iftene, Felicia (used until: 19 Jul 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: University of Cluj, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X7
Phone: (613) 548-6164
Fax: (613) 540-6196
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Iftene Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:08 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FELICIA IFTENE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. IFTENE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. IFTENE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. IFTENE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Jun 2024.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |