THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:27:23 PM
Martin, Isabelle
CPSO#:
89163
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bourque, Isabelle (used until: 30 Sep 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Student Health Services
Lambton College
1457 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7S 6K4
Phone: (519) 542-7751
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:02 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ISABELLE MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2018 |