THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:16:49 PM
Dore, Marc Joseph Pierre
CPSO#:
89146
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 Aug 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARC JOSEPH PIERRE DORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2012 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2013 |