THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 17:48:56 PM
Langdon, Matthew Dean
CPSO#:
88968
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3100-222 King St E
Advance Endoscopy & Specialist Cent
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: 905-419-7007
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW DEAN LANGDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2013 |