THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:57:13 AM
Jougheh Doust, Soghra
CPSO#:
88921
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Genetics Program
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-876-5185
Fax: 705-876-5129
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:03 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOGHRA JOUGHEH DOUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUGHEH DOUST is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2017 |