THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:28:51 PM
Miropolsky, Vladislav
CPSO#:
88668
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: University of Toronto, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronoation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Ext. 2249
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:26 May 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VLADISLAV MIROPOLSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIROPOLSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |