THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:57:00 AM
Leis, Jerome Allen
CPSO#:
88653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Infectious Diseases Clinic
Suite E209
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 67249
Fax: 416-480-4786
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:31 Oct 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEROME ALLEN LEIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2012 |