THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:38:55 PM
Doumit, Joseph
CPSO#:
88395
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Apr 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1191 Union Ave
Montreal QC H3B3C3
Phone: (514)400-3291 Ext. 2
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSEPH DOUMIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMIT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2014 |