THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:25:41 AM
Dahlke, Erin Jade
CPSO#:
88329
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
3E Med Ed Teaching Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000 Ext. 6607
Fax: 416-530-6386
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:18 Dec 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIN JADE DAHLKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLKE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2013 |