THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:40:49 PM
Aldandashi, Samer
CPSO#:
88312
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Alexandra Hospital
10240 Kingsway Avenue
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Phone: (780) 735-4181
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMER ALDANDASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDANDASHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2009 to 24 Aug 2009
EL - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2016 |