THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:36:05 AM
Ahmed, Syed Wajid
CPSO#:
88238
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
393 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1E6
Phone: 4379251031
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED WAJID AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2008 to 06 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2015 |