THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:31:38 PM
Czarnecki, Andrew
CPSO#:
88108
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D375
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-5880
Fax: 416-480-5827
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW CZARNECKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CZARNECKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 26 Aug 2008
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |