THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:35:50 AM
Damboragama, Shyamali Niranjala
CPSO#:
88101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: North Colombo Medical College, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-221 Brant Ave
Brantford ON N3T 3J2
Phone: 519-753-8666
Fax: 519-753-6880
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Feb 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHYAMALI NIRANJALA DAMBORAGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMBORAGAMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2010 to 02 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Feb 2010 |