THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:55:13 AM
Seron, Giselle
CPSO#:
88050
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lawrence-Patel, Giselle Mary Teresa (used until: 17 Dec 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bangalore University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Square One Medical Mgt Corp
Units 1 and 2
4175 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON L5B 0H1
Phone: (905) 848-4880
Fax: (905) 848-4882
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GISELLE SERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2009 |