THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 19:36:08 PM
Pasian, Sergio Giuntini
CPSO#:
87968
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: Pontificia Univ Catolica De Campinas, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3rd-7111 Syntex Dr
RealTime Medical
Mississauga ON L5N 8C3
Phone: +1 888-590-506
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SERGIO GIUNTINI PASIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2020 |