THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:33:30 AM
Jilkina, Tatiana Alexandrovna
CPSO#:
87871
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Spanish
Education: Astrakhan State Medical Academy, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
211 Lake Ave E
Carleton Place ON K7C 1J4
Phone: 6137971395
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities |
Rainy River |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:06 Oct 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TATIANA ALEXANDROVNA JILKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JILKINA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Ottawa, 06 Feb 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 05 Feb 2021
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |