THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:26:34 AM
Bhat, Mamatha Pallavi
CPSO#:
87824
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 May 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 May 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Kannada
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
MaRS 9-9950
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:04 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAMATHA PALLAVI BHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2015 |