THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:46:01 AM
Nesdoly, Christine Hope
CPSO#:
87778
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
02 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-May-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 02 May 2020 |