THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/03/24 22:48:24 PM
Marchi, Nicholas Alfred
CPSO#:
87590
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-1220
Fax: (905) 871-1221
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ALFRED MARCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |