THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:41:14 PM
Al-Rasheed, Taiba Abdulmohsen M
CPSO#:
87471
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Jul 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - R - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2008 to 03 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2009 to 03 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 03 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |