THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 21:51:50 PM
Wiens, Joel Lee
CPSO#:
87020
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Emergeny Medicine
1112 St Andrews Drive PO Box 760
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300 Ext. 1501
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL LEE WIENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2010 |