THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:39:04 PM
Trivieri, Maria Giovanna
CPSO#:
86933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Pisa, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital
One Gustave L. Levy Place, Box 1030
New York, NY 10029
New York NY 10029
United States
Phone: 212-241-7983
Fax: 212-241-3684
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Feb 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA GIOVANNA TRIVIERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIVIERI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2012 |