THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:01:17 AM
Fieghen, Heather Elizabeth
CPSO#:
86865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fieghen, Heather (used until: 27 Jun 2007 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Department of Medicine
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6084
Fax: (416) 530 6107
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEATHER ELIZABETH FIEGHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIEGHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |