THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:17:04 PM
Rouphael, Rita Elias
CPSO#:
86838
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Lebanese University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rita E. Rouphael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RITA ELIAS ROUPHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUPHAEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |