THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 22:47:37 PM
Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed
CPSO#:
86673
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Murji-Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 14 Jan 2009 )
Nimjee, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 03 Feb 2008 )
Murji, Tasleem Mohamed (used until: 28 Jan 2008 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Kachchi
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
Emergency Department
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:29 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TASLEEM MOHAMED NIMJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2009 |