THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:17:39 AM
Burton, Kirsteen Rennie
CPSO#:
86481
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 May 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEEN RENNIE BURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2022 |