THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 16:30:22 PM
Nevins, Tara Anne
CPSO#:
86266
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-381 Kent St
Ottawa ON K2P 2A8
Phone: (613) 234-5588
Fax: 613-232-4818
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARA ANNE NEVINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEVINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2010 |