THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 23:48:58 PM
Neffati, Abdurrahman Abdulhafiz L
CPSO#:
86152
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 28 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2016 |