THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 8:42:02 AM
El Zuway, Rabeh Mjihed Ali
CPSO#:
86092
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Garyounis University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RABEH MJIHED ALI EL ZUWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZUWAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 22 May 2007 to 20 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 21 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2008 to 23 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2009 to 23 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jul 2010 to 23 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 08 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2011 |