THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:53:29 AM
Indar, Rupert Arjoon
CPSO#:
86077
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
25 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of London, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2007 to 23 Jun 2007
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 25 Jan 2008
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jan 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Jun 2008 |