THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:38:40 PM
Kaya, Ebru
CPSO#:
86076
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room NU 9 924
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 2674
Fax: (416) 340-4823
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Jun 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 10 Jul 2007
PEAP - CF - Palliative Care Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
CF - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
|
Active |