THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:31:27 PM
Thomas, Isabelle Marie Beatrice
CPSO#:
85909
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Nov 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Paris, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:16 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Isabelle Marie Beatrice Thomas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 28, 2016:
Dr. Thomas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.